EP0724748 - CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIEB, Herbert Am Langrück 1 D-76316 Malsch / DE | 02 /
PREUSS, Hans-Peter Otto-Wels-Strasse 47 D-76189 Karlsruhe / DE | [1996/32] | Application number, filing date | 94928760.1 | 10.10.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994DE01187 | Priority number, date | DE19930015871U | 18.10.1993 Original published format: DE 9315871 U | [1996/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511478 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724748 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724748 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/42, G05B13/02 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
G05B11/42 (EP);
G05B13/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | REGELEINRICHTUNG | [1996/32] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE | [1996/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.01.1999 | SE | 13.01.1999 | PT | 13.04.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 13.01.1999 | |
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | PT | 13.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH01304501 ; | [X]JPS6073701 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900223), vol. 14, no. 101, Database accession no. (P - 1012), & JP01304501 A 19891208 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850831), vol. 9, no. 214, Database accession no. (P - 384), & JP60073701 A 19850425 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - J. BRAUN UND M. RAU, "Die Modellbildung und Regelung an einem thermischen Mehrschichtenwindkanal", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK - AT., MUNCHEN DE, (199309), vol. 41, no. 9, pages 331 - 339 [A] 1 * paragraph [02.4]; figure 8 * |