EP0724491 - CONTAINER WITH A CLOSED SYSTEM FOR CLEANING BOATS' HULLS ASHORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brandt, Christian Niederkasseler Strasse 15 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Ackmann, Günther, et al Ackmann Menges Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Ackmann, Günther, et al ACKMANN & MENGES Patentanwälte Postfach 10 01 01 47001 Duisburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94928800.5 | 23.09.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994EP03177 | Priority number, date | DE19934336675 | 27.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4336675 | [1996/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511763 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724491 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02, B63B59/06, B08B3/00 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B63B59/06 (EP,US);
B08B3/02 (EP,US);
B08B2230/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | CONTAINER MIT EINEM GESCHLOSSENEN SYSTEM ZUR REINIGUNG VON BOOTSKÖRPERN AN LAND | [1996/32] | English: | CONTAINER WITH A CLOSED SYSTEM FOR CLEANING BOATS' HULLS ASHORE | [1996/32] | French: | ENCEINTE POURVUE D'UN SYSTEME FERME DESTINEE AU NETTOYAGE DES COQUES DE BATEAUX A TERRE | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 24.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4279263 (PULLIAM WILLIAM D) [A] 1,2,4-6,9 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 15 *; | [A]WO9302912 (ECO SAFE SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 28 *; | [A]DE8807331U (J. NOLTE) [A] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 27 *; | [A]EP0178091 (SCHOFIELD PAUL SPENCER) [A] 10-12 * abstract * |