EP0760175 - ELECTRIC INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/10] | ELECTRIC INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING AND A CABLE HARNESS FOR INSTALLATION | ||
[1998/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PK Cables OY Kempeleentie 46 90440 Kempele / FI | [1997/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYYSSÖLÄ, Jari Kokkokankaantie 314 FIN-90450 Kempele / FI | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Dahlström, Karl Krister, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [1997/10] | Application number, filing date | 94928908.6 | 11.10.1994 | [1997/10] | WO1994FI00456 | Priority number, date | FI19930004504 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: FI 934504 | [1997/10] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510871 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760175 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760175 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/00 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
H02G3/00 (EP);
H01R13/64 (EP);
H01R43/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, NL, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | ELEKTROINSTALLATIONSEINRICHTUNG FÜR GEBÄUDE | [1998/35] | English: | ELECTRIC INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING | [1998/35] | French: | SYSTEME D'INSTALLATIONS ELECTRIQUES POUR BATIMENTS | [1998/35] |
Former [1997/10] | ELEKTROINSTALLATIONSEINRICHTUNG FÜR GEBÄUDE UND KABELBAUMINSTALLATION | ||
Former [1997/10] | ELECTRIC INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING AND A CABLE HARNESS FOR INSTALLATION | ||
Former [1997/10] | SYSTEME D'INSTALLATIONS ELECTRIQUES POUR BATIMENTS ET TRESSES DE CABLES ASSOCIEES | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1995 | Translation filed | 11.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.04.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4775802 (DODS TERRY E [CA]); | [Y]DE3719384 (SEMPERLUX GMBH [DE]) | Examination | GB1394406 | US4689493 | WO9207396 |