EP0723716 - OPTICAL PULSE SEQUENCE GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCEK, Julian, Kazimierz 52 Wellesley Road Ipswich Suffolk IP4 1PL / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Kevin Cherry Tree Cottage Erwarton Ipswich Suffolk IP9 1LN / GB | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street, London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94928988.8 | 11.10.1994 | [1996/31] | WO1994GB02239 | Priority number, date | EP19930308067 | 11.10.1993 Original published format: EP 93308067 | GB19940006882 | 07.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9406882 | EP19940303193 | 03.05.1994 Original published format: EP 94303193 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510870 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723716 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723716 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/098, H01S3/06, H04J14/08 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
H01S3/1112 (EP,US);
G02F1/3517 (EP,US);
H01S3/06791 (EP,US);
H01S5/50 (EP,US);
H04B10/50 (EP,US);
H04J14/08 (EP,US);
H04L7/0075 (EP,US);
G02F1/3519 (EP,US);
G02F2/006 (EP,US);
G02F2203/54 (EP,US);
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
H01S3/083 (EP,US);
H01S3/10092 (EP,US);
H01S5/0057 (EP,US);
H01S5/041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/31] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER PULSSEQUENZGENERATOR | [1996/31] | English: | OPTICAL PULSE SEQUENCE GENERATOR | [1996/31] | French: | GENERATEUR DE SEQUENCE D'IMPULSIONS OPTIQUES | [1996/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - K.SMITH ET AL., "All optical clock recovery using a mode locked laser", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., ENAGE GB, (19920910), vol. 28, no. 19, pages 1814 - 1816, XP000310790 [DA] 1,4,13 * page 1815, column L, line 1 - line 15; figure 1 * | [A] - E.J.GREER ET AL., "All optical fm mode-locking of fibre laser", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., ENAGE GB, (19920827), vol. 28, no. 18, pages 1741 - 1743, XP000309486 [A] 1,4,13 * abstract * * page 1742, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19921107 | [A] - J.LUCEK ET AL., "All optical signal regenerator", OPTICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19930801), vol. 18, no. 15, pages 1226 - 1228, XP000382933 [A] 1,4,13 * abstract * * page 1226, column L, paragraph 2 * | [A] - K.J.BLOW ET AL., "Demonstration of the non linear fibre loop mirror as an ultrafast all-optical demultiplexer", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., ENAGE GB, (19900705), vol. 26, no. 14, pages 962 - 964, XP000107118 [A] 1,4,13 * abstract * | [PX] - M.OBRO ET AL., "An optically programmable mode-locked laser", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (199407), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 799 - 800, XP000465526 [PX] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.311458 |