EP0721616 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION CONCERNING PRODUCTS, USING RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEATTLE SILICON CORPORATION Suite 200, 4122-128th Avenue S.E. Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | For all designated states Krueger, Thomas E. 12450-68th Avenue N.E. Kirkland, WA 98034-5706 / US | For all designated states Astrof, Kenneth L. 7311-172nd Street S.W. Edmonds, WA 98026 / US | [1996/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUEGER, Thomas, E. 12450 - 68th Avenue NE Kirkland, WA 98034-5706 / US | 02 /
ASTROF, Kenneth, L. 7311 - 172nd Street SW Edmonds, WA 98026 / US | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94929294.0 | 22.09.1994 | [1996/29] | WO1994US10715 | Priority number, date | US19930125518 | 22.09.1993 Original published format: US 125518 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508795 | Date: | 30.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721616 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/147, G06K17/00 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
G06K19/0704 (EP,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G06K19/07703 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K7/10039 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/04] |
Former [1996/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON PRODUKT-INFORMATIONEN MIT ÜBERTRAGUNG VON HOCHFREQUENZSIGNALEN | [2000/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION CONCERNING PRODUCTS, USING RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMISSIONS | [1996/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL TRANSMETTANT PAR FREQUENCES RADIO DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A DES PRODUITS | [1996/29] |
Former [1996/29] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSORGUNG VON PRODUKT-INFORMATIONEN MIT ÜBERTRAGUNG VON RADIOFREQUENZSIGNALEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 23.04.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/05] | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.06.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4656463 (ANDERS FRANK W [US], et al) [X] 1-8,14-21,27-31 * see Abstract; column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 21; figures 1,5-7,11; claim 1 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 20 * * column 8, line 32 - line 63 * * column 9, line 15 - line 43 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 61 * * column 16, line 4 - line 9 * * column 18, line 41 - column 19, line 11 * * column 21, line 32 - column 27, line 22 * * column 29, line 64 - column 31, line 11 * [Y] 9,22,32; | [YA]WO9000775 (HELLQUIST MAGNUS [SE], et al) [Y] 9,22,32 * see Abstract; page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 18; figures 1-5 * * page 6, line 10 - page 12, line 7 * [A] 10-13,23-26,33-35; | [XA]JPH0418696 ; | [A]US4962466 (REVESZ MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,14,15,27 * see Abstract; column 2, line 10 - line 51 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 10 *; | [A]US4821291 (STEVENS JOHN K [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,14,15,27 * see Abstract; column 1, line 1 - line 13; figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 19 - column 7, line 40 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920427), vol. 16, no. 175, Database accession no. (P - 1344), & JP04018696 A 19920122 (CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.) [X] 1,2,14,15,27 * abstract * [A] 6,7,19,20,30 |