EP0720684 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR HORIZONTAL WELL DRILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landers, Carl W. 141 S. Union Street Madisonville, KY 42431 / US | [1996/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94929354.2 | 26.09.1994 | [1996/28] | WO1994US10892 | Priority number, date | US19930131526 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: US 131526 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509963 | Date: | 13.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720684 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720684 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/06, E21B7/06, E21B17/20, E21B7/18, F16C1/04 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
E21B7/061 (EP,US);
E21B17/20 (EP,US);
E21B29/06 (EP,US);
E21B7/18 (EP,US);
F16C1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BOHREN EINES HORIZONTALEN LOCHES | [1996/28] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR HORIZONTAL WELL DRILLING | [1996/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FORAGE HORIZONTAL | [1996/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE485867 (RUEGGEBERG AUGUST FA) [A] 15 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR702530 (BARBER) [A] 24,25 * page 1, line 15 - line 29 * * page 3, line 46 - line 51; figure 18 *; | [A]FR1289136 (HOOVER LTD) [A] 24,25 * page 2, line 4 - line 8 ** page 2, line 33 - line 38 *; | [YA]US3536151 (AARUP CARL P) [Y] 17 * figure 4 * [A] 4,18; | [X]FR2091931 (PETROLES CIE FRANCAISE) [X] 10 * page 7, line 36 - line 40 * * page 8, line 6 - line 16; figure 6 *; | [XY]FR2232669 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 10 * page 2, line 25 - line 32; figure 1 * [Y] 17; | [A]US4007797 (JETER JOHN D) [A] 2,11 * column 4, line 37 - line 43 *; | [X]US4185705 (BULLARD GERALD [US]) [X] 10; | [A]US4631136 (JONES III REED W [US]) [A] 5-8,19-22 * abstract *; | [X]US4640362 (SCHELLSTEDE HERMAN J [US]) [X] 16,17 * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 10 * * column 11, line 3 - line 39; figures 5I,16 *; | [A]US4850440 (SMET NIC H W [BE]) [A] 4,18 * column 6, line 45 - line 56; figure 3 *; | [A]US5148877 (MACGREGOR DONALD C [US]) [A] 15 * figures 14,15 * |