EP0720563 - BAG TYIER WITH A RIBBON SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/28] | RIBBON SENSING DEVICE FOR BAG TYER | ||
[2000/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURFORD CORP. P.O. Box 714 Maysville, OK 73057 / US | [1996/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAZIER, Jimmy, R. 504 Baker Street Norman, OK 73072 / US | 02 /
RICHARDSON, John, D. 12301 S.E. 71st Street Oklahoma City, OK 73150 / US | 03 /
COXSEY, Greg, P. 3412 Pathway Circle Norman, OK 73072 / US | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Howick, Nicholas Keith CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94929399.7 | 30.09.1994 | [1996/28] | WO1994US11183 | Priority number, date | US19930129284 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: US 129284 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509104 | Date: | 06.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720563 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720563 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/06, B65B51/08, H02P5/46 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
H02P8/00 (EP,US);
B65B51/08 (EP,US);
H02P5/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | BEUTELSCHNÜRMASCHINE MIT EINER BANDFÜHLERVORRICHTUNG | [2000/20] | English: | BAG TYIER WITH A RIBBON SENSING DEVICE | [2000/20] | French: | LIEUSE DE SACS EQUIPPEE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE RUBAN | [2000/20] |
Former [1996/28] | BANDFÜHLERVORRICHTUNG IN EINER BEUTELSCHNÜRMASCHINE | ||
Former [1996/28] | RIBBON SENSING DEVICE FOR BAG TYER | ||
Former [1996/28] | DISPOSITIF DE PALPAGE D'UN RUBAN DE LIEUSE DE SACS | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 28.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00200538.7 / EP1016591 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2001 | BE | 06.06.2001 | CH | 06.06.2001 | FR | 06.06.2001 | GR | 06.06.2001 | LI | 06.06.2001 | DK | 06.09.2001 | PT | 06.09.2001 | SE | 06.09.2001 | DE | 07.09.2001 | LU | 30.09.2001 | MC | 30.09.2001 | IE | 01.10.2001 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/42] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
GR | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
DK | 06.09.2001 | ||
PT | 06.09.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
LU | 30.09.2001 | ||
MC | 30.09.2001 | ||
IE | 01.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
GR | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
DK | 06.09.2001 | ||
PT | 06.09.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
LU | 30.09.2001 | ||
MC | 30.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
GR | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
DK | 06.09.2001 | ||
PT | 06.09.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 30.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
DK | 06.09.2001 | ||
PT | 06.09.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 30.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
PT | 06.09.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 30.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
PT | 06.09.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
BE | 06.06.2001 | ||
CH | 06.06.2001 | ||
LI | 06.06.2001 | ||
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
DE | 07.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 06.06.2001 | |
SE | 06.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 06.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2019040 (POWER LTD F A, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 54-117; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US4277731 (PONGRACZ ENDRE) [Y] 13-15,18-22 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0092378 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 13-15* page 1, line 8 - page 6, line 33; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2205081 (STRAPACK CORP) [A] 2,4,16 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [DY]US4856258 (BURFORD CHARLES E [US], et al) [DY] 1-3,6-10,13-15,18-22 * column 2, line 32 - column 9, line 12; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US4907392 (KNUDSEN DAVID S [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0400379 (LINDEMANN MASCHFAB GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6-10 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 36; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US4856258 (BURFORD CHARLES E [US], et al); | [X]US5194793 (NIIMI YOSHIHIRO [JP]) |