EP0723734 - BOTTOM ELECTRODE FOR A METALLURGICAL VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [1998/21] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 D-40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Lutz Holbeinweg 44 D-47228 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
SCHAEFERS, Gerhard Trankehnenstrasse 8B D-47445 Moers / DE | 03 /
FEUERSTACKE, Ewald Sperberstrasse 2 D-46282 Dorsten / DE | 04 /
HOFMANN, Werner Feldstrasse 53a D-47441 Moers / DE | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Presting, Hans-Joachim, et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 94929472.2 | 10.10.1994 | [1996/31] | WO1994DE01217 | Priority number, date | DE19934335065 | 11.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4335065 | [1996/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510929 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723734 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723734 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/02, H05B7/06, H05B7/12 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
H05B7/06 (EP,US);
C21C5/5229 (EP,US);
F27B3/085 (EP,US);
C21C2005/5235 (EP,US);
F27D2009/0016 (EP,US);
F27D2099/0023 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [1996/31] | Title | German: | BODENELEKTRODE FÜR EIN METALLURGISCHES GEFÄSS | [1996/31] | English: | BOTTOM ELECTRODE FOR A METALLURGICAL VESSEL | [1996/31] | French: | ELECTRODE DE SOLE POUR CUVE METALLURGIQUE | [1996/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0012050 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH [FR]) [A] 1; | [A]US4628516 (VOSS-SPILKER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1; | [A]DE4026897 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]US5125003 (HAMY MICHEL [FR], et al)[A] 1 |