EP0721597 - ACOUSTO-OPTIC FILTER WITH NEAR-IDEAL BANDPASS CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. 445 South Street Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [1999/51] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 290 West Mt. Pleasant Avenue Livingston, New Jersey 07039-2729 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Ghie, Hugh Dept. Inf.&Comm. Kwangju Inst.of Sci.&techn. KJIST 572 SangAmDong KwangsanGuKwangju 506-303 / US | [1996/31] |
Former [1996/29] | 01 /
SONG, Ghie, Hugh 33 Beaumont Court Tinton Falls, NJ 07724 / US | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94929811.1 | 15.09.1994 | [1996/29] | WO1994US10440 | Priority number, date | US19930131522 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: US 131522 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510791 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721597 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/26, G02F1/11, G02F1/125 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G02F1/125 (EP,US);
G02F1/0142 (EP,US);
G02F2203/055 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/29] | G02B6/26, G02F1/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | AKUSTOOPTISCHES FILTER MIT NAHEZU IDEALER BANDPASSCHARAKTERISTIK | [1996/29] | English: | ACOUSTO-OPTIC FILTER WITH NEAR-IDEAL BANDPASS CHARACTERISTICS | [1996/29] | French: | FILTRE ACOUSTO-OPTIQUE A CARACTERISTIQUES PASSE-BANDE QUASI IDEALES | [1996/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 18.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SMITH D A ET AL, "Sidelobe suppression in an acousto-optic filter with a raised-cosine interaction strength", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, 31 AUG. 1992, USA, ISSN 0003-6951, vol. 61, no. 9, pages 1025 - 1027, XP002007478 [A] 1-4,7-11,13,15,18,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.107704� | [PX] - SONG G H, "Proposal for acousto-optic tunable filters with near-ideal bandpass characteristics", APPLIED OPTICS, 1 NOV. 1994, USA, ISSN 0003-6935, vol. 33, no. 31, pages 7458 - 7460, XP000477979 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.33.007458 | International search | [A]US4273411 (ALFERNESS RODNEY C); | [A]US4390236 (ALFERNESS RODNEY C); | [A]US4781425 (RISK WILLIAM P [US], et al); | [A]US5002349 (CHEUNG KWOK-WAI [US], et al); | [Y]US5218653 (JOHNSON JOHN J [US], et al) |