EP0727067 - APPARATUS FOR ACCELERATING PROCESSING OF TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER DATABASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paracom Corporation 10 Tower Office Park, 312 Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [1996/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUEI, Lin, M. Apartment 39 315 Charger Street Revere, MA 02151 / US | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94930585.8 | 04.10.1994 | [1996/34] | WO1994US11261 | Priority number, date | US19930147147 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: US 147147 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512846 | Date: | 11.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727067 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/08, G06F9/00, G06F13/00, G06F17/30 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
G06F16/252 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99932 (US)
|
Former IPC [1996/34] | G06F7/08, G06F9/00, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESCHLEUNIGTEN VERARBEITUNG VON TRANSAKTIONEN AUF RECHNERDATENBANKEN | [1996/34] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ACCELERATING PROCESSING OF TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER DATABASES | [1996/34] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACCELERATION DU TRAITEMENT DES TRANSACTIONS SUR DES BASES DE DONNEES INFORMATIQUES | [1996/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1996 | Search fee paid | 21.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 03.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/45] | 31.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - KNUTH D.E., Sorting and Searching - The Art of Computer Programming, MASSACHUSETTS, US, READING, ADDISON WESLEY., (1973), XP002053794 [X] 16 * page 406, line 1 - page 419, line 40 * [A] 1,3,4 | International search | [Y]US3651483 (CLARK WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]US4575789 (TSUYAMA SADAHARU [JP]); | [A]US4630234 (HOLLY JAMES R [US]); | [X]US4633391 (RUNDELL JOHN P [US]); | [A]US4644471 (KOJIMA KEIJI [JP], et al); | [A]US5073854 (MARTIN MICHAEL W [GB], et al); | [X]US5129074 (KIKUCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5136707 (BLOCK FREDERICK P [US], et al); | [A]US5210870 (BAUM RICHARD I [US], et al); | [A]US5226165 (MARTIN MICHAEL W [GB]); | [AP]US5261065 (URABE SHOO [JP], et al); | [YP]US5265260 (HENDRICKS JERRY E [US]); | [YP]US5283894 (DERAN ROGER L [US]); | [AP]US5305389 (PALMER MARK L [US]) |