EP0726948 - METHOD OF INDUCING AND MAINTAINING NEURONAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 124 Mount Auburn Street University Place Fourth Floor South Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE 124 Mount Auburn Street, University Place, Fourth Floor South Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | ||
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE University Place, 4th floor South, 124 Mt. Aubern Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELTON, Douglas, A. 22 Flocum Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 02 /
HEMMATI-BRIVANLOU, Ali 325 East 84th Street New York, NY 10028 / US | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 94930791.2 | 14.10.1994 | [1996/34] | WO1994US11745 | Priority number, date | US19930136748 | 14.10.1993 Original published format: US 136748 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510611 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726948 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726948 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, A61K48/00, A61K38/18, C12N5/06, G01N33/50 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
A61K31/17 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K38/1841 (EP,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61K38/1858 (EP,US);
A61K38/22 (EP,US);
A61K38/57 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K14/46 (EP,US);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1841, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1858, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/185, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG UND ZUR ERHALTUNG NEURONALEN ZELLEN | [1996/34] | English: | METHOD OF INDUCING AND MAINTAINING NEURONAL CELLS | [1996/34] | French: | PROCEDE D'INDUCTION ET DE MAINTIEN DE CELLULES NEURONALES | [1996/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Request for further processing for: | 27.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 01.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | FR | 28.02.2007 | IT | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | DE | 30.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | GB | 14.10.2007 | LU | 14.10.2007 | IE | 15.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
GB | 14.10.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X] - A. HEMMATI-BRIVANLOU AND D.A. MELTON, "A truncated activin receptor inhibits mesoderm induction and formation of axial structures in Xenopus embryos", NATURE, (1992), vol. 359, pages 609 - 614 [X] 1-8,13-15,17,18,25,26,41-44 * see the whole document, especially the discussion. * | [X] - M. HASHIMOTO ET AL., "Follistatin is a developmentally regulated cytokine in neural differentiation", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 7203 - 7206 [X] 1-4,17,18,25,26,41,42 * see the whole document. * | [A] - M. HASHIMOTO ET AL., "Activin/EDF as an inhibitor of neural differentiation", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1990), vol. 173, pages 193 - 200 [A] 1 * see the abstract. * | [PX] - A. HEMMATI-BRIVANLOU AND D.A. MELTON, "Inhibition of activin receptor signaling promotes neuralization in Xenopus", CELL, (1994), vol. 77, pages 273 - 281 [PX] 1-6,13-15,17,18,25,26,41-44 * see the whole document. * | [PX] - A. HEMMATI-BRIVANLOU ET AL., "Follistatin, an antagonist of activin, is expressed in the Spemann organizer and displays direct neuralizing activity", CELL, (1994), vol. 77, pages 283 - 295 [PX] 1-4,14,15,17,18,25,26,41-44 * see the whole document. * |