EP0678125 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR THE ELECTROLYTIC SEPARATION OF METALS WITH THE AID OF A ROTATING CATHODE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingenieurbüro und Labor für Galvanotechnik Jürgen Leudolph Untere Dürrmühlestrasse 13 4704 Niederbipp / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states Ingenieurbüro und Labor für Galvanotechnik Jürgen Leudolph Untere Dürrmühlestrasse 13 CH-4704 Niederbipp / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUDOLPH, Jürgen Untere Dürrmühlestrasse 13 CH-4704 Niederbipp / CH | 02 /
ROSELT, Frank St. Peter-Strasse 73 CH-4703 Kestenholz / CH | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Goth, Helmut DILTEC AG, Technopark, Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Goth, Helmut, Dr. DILTEC AG, Technopark, Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1996/47] | Goth, Helmut GFF, Technopark, Pfingstweidstrasse 30 8005 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94930904.1 | 08.11.1994 | [1995/43] | WO1994CH00217 | Priority number, date | CH19930003348 | 08.11.1993 Original published format: CH 334893 | [1995/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513408 | Date: | 18.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678125 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678125 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/00 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
C25C7/00 (EP,US);
B29C35/08 (CZ);
B29C71/04 (CZ);
H05B6/64 (CZ)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN ABSCHEIDUNG VON METALLEN MITTELS EINES ROTIERENDEN KATHODENSYSTEMS | [1995/43] | English: | DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR THE ELECTROLYTIC SEPARATION OF METALS WITH THE AID OF A ROTATING CATHODE SYSTEM | [1995/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION ELECTROLYTIQUE DE METAUX AU MOYEN D'UN SYSTEME DE CATHODE ROTATIVE | [1995/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1535577 (WYLD CLEAVE ARTHUR HAROLD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 89 - page 2, line 35 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US3919070 (GOOLD REED, et al) |