EP0724667 - BALLASTLESS SUPERSTRUCTURE WITH CONCRETE SLEEPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rudersdorf, Friedemann, Dipl.-Ing. Berndorffstrasse 2 50968 Köln / DE | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states BETONWERK RETHWISCH GmbH Industriegelände 1 D-17219 Möllenhagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/32] | 01 /
RUDERSDORF, Friedemann Eichmühlenweg 35 D-92318 Neumarkt / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/38] |
Former [1998/35] | Effert, Udo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1996/32] | Effert, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 94930934.8 | 18.10.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994DE01262 | Priority number, date | DE19934335877 | 18.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4335877 | DE19944437826 | 14.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4437826 | DE19940017008U | 14.10.1994 Original published format: DE 9417008 U | [1996/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511345 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724667 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E01B1/00, E01B9/18, E01B19/00 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
E01B29/005 (EP);
E01B1/007 (EP);
E01B3/28 (EP);
E01B2204/06 (EP);
E01B2204/09 (EP);
E01B2204/10 (EP);
E01B2204/13 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, IT [1996/32] | Title | German: | SCHOTTERLOSER OBERBAU MIT BETONSCHWELLEN | [1996/32] | English: | BALLASTLESS SUPERSTRUCTURE WITH CONCRETE SLEEPERS | [1996/32] | French: | SUPERSTRUCTURE SANS BALLAST A TRAVERSES EN BETON | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 29.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/13] | 31.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1998 | 31.10.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3361351 (MOSES ET AL.) [A] 1,21 * column 5, line 15 - line 18 * * column 5, line 39 - line 51 * * figure - *; | [AP]EP0576392 (ETABLISSEMENTS VAPE S.A.) [AP] 1,21 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]FR2657096 (TRAVAUX DU SUD-OUEST S.A.) [A] 1,21 * page 8, line 9 - line 21 * * claim 10 *; | [A]US4652495 (SATO ET AL.) [A] 1,21 * figures 4,5,8 * * column 4, line 46 - line 52 *; | [A]US4728032 (GETZNER-CHEMIE G.M.B.H.) [A] 17 * figure - *; | [A]WO8901543 (IRETE S.A.) [A] 5,21 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 22 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE3539225 (FIRMA MAX KNAPE G.M.B.H. & CO.) [A] 1,21 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - line 38 * |