EP0685030 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE FUEL INJECTOR CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUBETTI, Paolo Via Colombatto, 10 I-10036 Settimo Torinese / IT | 02 /
GROPPO, Riccardo Via Costa, 83 I-10060 Roletto / IT | 03 /
BORTIGNON, Giorgio Via Dante Aligheiri, 10 I-10045 Piossasco / IT | [1995/49] | Application number, filing date | 94931032.0 | 31.10.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994EP03600 | Priority number, date | IT1993TO00870 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: IT TO930870 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514162 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685030 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685030 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/20 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
F02D41/20 (EP);
H01F7/1816 (EP);
F02D2041/2006 (EP);
F02D2041/2017 (EP);
H01H47/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSTEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1998/37] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE FUEL INJECTOR CONTROL SYSTEM | [1995/49] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DES INJECTEURS DE CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1995/49] |
Former [1995/49] | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSTEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASHINE | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0212777 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 13 - page 9, line 15; figure - *; | [X]EP0305344 (MARELLI AUTRONICA [IT]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 60; figure - *; | [A]US5161510 (YAMADA AKIRA [JP]); | [X]EP0548915 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * column 2, line 54 - column 7, line 19; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0563760 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) |