EP0675909 - SUPERABSORBENT POLYMERS AND PRODUCTS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states ALLIED COLLOIDS LIMITED P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Ian Michael 23 Bankfield Drive, Nabwood Shipley, West Yorkshire BD18 4AD / GB | 02 /
COULDWELL, Pauline Lesley 144 Leeds Road, Birstall Batley, West Yorkshire WF17 0HH / GB | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94931096.5 | 26.10.1994 | [1995/41] | WO1994GB02351 | Priority number, date | GB19930022119 | 27.10.1993 Original published format: GB 9322119 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511932 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675909 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675909 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/04, A61L15/00 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
C08F220/04 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/41] | Extension states | LT | 07.07.1995 | SI | 07.07.1995 | Title | German: | SUPERABSOBIERENDE POLYMERE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PRODUKTE | [1995/41] | English: | SUPERABSORBENT POLYMERS AND PRODUCTS CONTAINING THEM | [1995/41] | French: | POLYMERES SUPERABSORBANTS ET PRODUITS LES CONTENANT | [1995/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9200108 (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP0530438 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** page 3, paragraph 1 *; | [PX]WO9415651 (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-6,8,10,11 * abstract * |