EP0677007 - GEAR-CHANGING SYSTEM FOR TWO-WHEEL VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hugelshofer, Werner, Alfred Brunngasse 3 CH-4208 Nunningen / CH | [1995/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILANESE, Adrian Sempacherstrasse 34 CH-4053 Basel / CH | [1995/42] | Application number, filing date | 94931483.5 | 10.11.1994 | [1995/42] | WO1994CH00219 | Priority number, date | CH19930003374 | 10.11.1993 Original published format: CH 337493 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513209 | Date: | 18.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677007 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/14 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
B62M9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/42] | Title | German: | GANGWECHSELVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZWEIRÄDER | [1995/42] | English: | GEAR-CHANGING SYSTEM FOR TWO-WHEEL VEHICLES | [1995/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE POUR DEUX-ROUES | [1995/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/36] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.1997 | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3838359 (GEGGERLE) [A] 1; | [A]GB2240825 (FURIONG) [A] 1 |