EP0729637 - ELECTRICAL GAS-BLAST SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLFF, Klaus-Peter Olwenstrasse 23a D-13465 Berlin / DE | [1996/36] | Application number, filing date | 94931508.9 | 27.10.1994 | [1996/36] | WO1994DE01298 | Priority number, date | DE19934339923 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4339923 | [1996/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514303 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729637 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729637 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/88 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H01H33/882 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER DRUCKGASSCHALTER | [1996/36] | English: | ELECTRICAL GAS-BLAST SWITCH | [1996/36] | French: | DISJONCTEUR ELECTRIQUE A GAZ COMPRIME | [1996/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3231169 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [X] 1,2 * page 11, line L - page 12, line 1; figure . *; | [A]DE2618087 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 3 * page 11, paragraph 2; figure 2 * |