EP0726015 - DUAL-MODE ISDN/STN VIDEO TELEPHONY TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [1999/01] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERVE, Philippe Thomson-CSF SCPI, Boîte postale 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1996/35] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON Multimedia, 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 5 92050 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [1996/33] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON multimedia, 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 5 92050 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 94931620.2 | 21.10.1994 | [1996/33] | WO1994FR01230 | Priority number, date | FR19930012755 | 26.10.1993 Original published format: FR 9312755 | [1996/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512281 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726015 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726015 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
H04N7/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/33] | Title | German: | ZWEIMODEN-BILDFERNSPRECHSTATION FÜR ISDN UND ÖFFENTLICHE TELEFONNETZE | [1996/33] | English: | DUAL-MODE ISDN/STN VIDEO TELEPHONY TERMINAL | [1996/33] | French: | TERMINAL DE VISIOPHONIE BI-MODE RNIS/RTC | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0558377 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, column 2, line 46 - page 3, column 4, line 9 * * page 6, column 10, line 52 - page 7, column 11, line 35 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 3; | [Y]EP0495574 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, column 3, line 19 - page 4, column 6, line 30 * * figures 1-4 * |