Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3012335B | Global Dossier | 21.02.2000 | B2 | JPH08511147 | 19.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0977444 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2001 | B1 | EP0977444 | 22.03.2000 | A3 | EP0977444 | 02.02.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP94931888 | 13.10.1994 | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0975179 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2002 | B1 | EP0975179 | 22.03.2000 | A3 | EP0975179 | 26.01.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP94931888 | 13.10.1994 | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU675185B | Global Dossier | 23.01.1997 | B2 | AU8080794 | 22.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0726016 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2000 | B1 | EP0726016 | 16.07.1997 | A4 | EP0726016 | 14.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE198250T | 15.01.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2174112 | 02.05.2000 | C | CA2174112 | 04.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69426460T | 31.05.2001 | T2 | DE69426460D1 | 25.01.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE726016T | 15.01.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0726016T | 08.01.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3035255T | 30.04.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3036897T | 31.01.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP94931888 | 13.10.1994 | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100235288B | 15.12.1999 | B1 | KR960706265 | 08.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | US9411824 | 13.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9512283 | Global Dossier | 04.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3502308B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2004 | B2 | JP2000102034 | 07.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE206266T | 15.10.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE218782T | 15.06.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69428473T | 16.05.2002 | T2 | DE69428473D1 | 31.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69430764T | 06.02.2003 | T2 | DE69430764D1 | 11.07.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0975179T | 15.07.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0977444T | 03.12.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2152994T | 16.02.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2163914T | 01.02.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2177186T | 01.12.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1025456 | 10.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT726016E | 30.03.2001 | E | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT975179E | 30.09.2002 | E | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT977444E | 30.01.2002 | E | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5488410 | 30.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US14597993 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Divisional application | EP0975179 | EP0977444 |