EP0726016 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISK SOFTWARE PUBLISHERS TO CONTROL DISK DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIME WARNER ENTERTAINMENT CO., L.P. 4000 Warner Boulevard Burbank, CA 91522 / US | [1996/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBERFARB, Warren, N. 15147 Mulholland Drive Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US | 02 /
COOKSON, Christopher, J. 7825 Torreyson Drive Los Angeles, CA 90046 / US | 03 /
OSTOVER, Lewis, S. 4021 Cumberland Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | Hackett, Sean James, et al Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1996/33] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94931888.5 | 13.10.1994 | [1996/33] | WO1994US11824 | Priority number, date | US19930145979 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: US 145979 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512283 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726016 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726016 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, H04N5/46, H04L9/00 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
G11B23/282 (EP,US);
H04N7/167 (KR);
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00094 (EP,US);
G11B20/00115 (EP,US);
G11B20/00123 (EP,US);
G11B20/00137 (EP,US);
G11B20/00144 (EP,US);
G11B20/00159 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00557 (EP,US);
G11B23/36 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/00 (KR);
H04N5/46 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (EP,US);
H04N9/877 (EP,US);
A63F2300/206 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,US);
H04N5/602 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8045 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
H04N9/8233 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR HERAUSGEBER VON DISKETTENPROGRAMMEN ZUR STEUERUNG DER DISKETTENVERTEILUNG | [1996/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISK SOFTWARE PUBLISHERS TO CONTROL DISK DISTRIBUTION | [1996/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT A DES DIFFUSEURS DE LOGICIELS SUR DISQUES DE CONTROLER LA DISTRIBUTION DES DISQUES | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 19.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99119890.4 / EP0975179 | EP99119891.2 / EP0977444 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5036537 (JEFFERS JOHN M [CA], et al); | [X]US5111160 (HERSHBERGER DAVID L [US]) | [X] - M. BROWN, Living Books, "Arthur's Teacher Trouble", (CD-ROM), August 1992, RANDOM HOUSE/BRODERBUND COMPANY (NOVATO, CA), Note Technical Notes for the Macintosh and for the MS-DOS Systems. |