EP0783423 - BOGIE COUPLING SYSTEM FOR CONVERTIBLE RAILWAY-ROADWAY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Larson, Ernest J. Jr. 7408 West Shore Drive Edina, MN 55435 / US | [1997/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSON, Ernest, J., Jr. 7408 West Shore Drive Edina, MN 55435 / US | 02 /
SIMS, Roger, D. Suite 1 8516 Henry Street Highland, IN 46322 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [1998/32] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, et al Mozartstrasse 23 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/29] | Hauck, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Mozartstrasse 23 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94932172.3 | 08.08.1994 | [1997/29] | WO1994US08929 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605094 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783423 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783423 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B61D3/18, B61F3/12 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
B61D3/184 (EP);
B61F3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/29] | Title | German: | DREHGESTELL KUPPLUNGS-SYSTEM FÜR EIN UMWANDELBARES SCHIENE-STRASSE FAHRZEUG | [1997/29] | English: | BOGIE COUPLING SYSTEM FOR CONVERTIBLE RAILWAY-ROADWAY VEHICLE | [1997/29] | French: | SYSTEME DE RACCORDEMENT DE BOGIE DESTINE A UN VEHICULE CONVERTIBLE RAIL/ROUTE | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01114481.3 / EP1145928 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.1996 | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1998 | 31.08.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]EP0483924 ; | [Y]US4416571 ; | [Y]US4773336 ; | [A]US5220870 ; | [A]DE961714 ; | [A]US4685399 |