EP0662311 - Method and apparatus of applying high-frequency wave current to acupuncture points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yugen Kaisha Toyo Igaku No. 40-6, Toromachi 1-chome Omiya City Saitama Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states Yugen Kaisha Toyo Igaku No. 40-6, Toromachi 1-chome Omiya City, Saitama Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Mamoru, c/o Yugen Kaisha Toyo Igaku No. 40-6, Toromachi 1-chome Omiya City, Saitama Prefecture / JP | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100056.1 | 03.01.1995 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | JP19940000659 | 10.01.1994 Original published format: JP 65994 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662311 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61H39/00, A61H39/02, A61N1/36 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
A61N1/06 (EP,US);
A61H39/002 (EP,US);
A61H39/02 (EP,US);
A61N1/36031 (EP,US);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
A61N1/0502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung der Akupunkturpunkten mittels Hochfrequenzstrom | [1995/28] | English: | Method and apparatus of applying high-frequency wave current to acupuncture points | [1995/28] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'application d'un courant haute-fréquence aux points d'acupuncture | [1995/28] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 03.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 13.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/28] | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4006916 (SEGHERS A MIKROELEKTRONIK VEB [DE]) [X] 2,9 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 35; figure - *; | [A]US5012816 (LEDERER GABOR [US]) [A] 2,9 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US3939841 (DOHRING ALBERT A, et al) [A] 2 * column A; figure - * * column 2, line 15 - line 20 *; | [A]DE2634401 (PITTERLING ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,9 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3044837 (MERSMANN LUDGER) [A] 2,9 * claim 5 * | [A] - IEEE Transactions on Biomedical Engineering 35 (1988) March, No. 3, New York, USA. p.203-208 : Tatsuma Yamamoto et al. [A] 2 * 'Measurement of Low-Resistance Points on the Skin by Dry Roller Electrodes' * |