EP0649152 - Transformer integrable with a semiconductor integrated circuit and method for producing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andoh, Naoto, c/o Mitsubishi Denki KK, Optoelec. & Microwave Devices R&D Lab., 1, Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Akira, c/o Mitsubishi Denki KK, Optoelec. & Microwave Devices R&D Lab., 1, Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakajima, Yasuharu, c/o Mitsub. Denki KK, Optoelec & Microwave Devices R&D Lab., 1, Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakahara, Kazuhito, c/o Mitsub. Denki KK, Optoelec & Microwave Devices R&D Lab., 1, Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100214.6 | 17.08.1990 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890213839 | 18.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21383989 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0649152 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0649152 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649152 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01F17/00, H01F27/28, H01F41/04, H01L27/08 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
H01L28/10 (EP,US);
H01F17/0006 (EP,US);
H01F17/0033 (EP,US);
H01F21/02 (EP);
H01F21/08 (EP,US);
H01F27/2804 (EP,US);
H01L23/645 (EP,US);
H01F2017/004 (EP,US);
H01F2017/0046 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/16] | H01F17/00, H01F27/28, H01F41/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/16] | Title | German: | Transformator integrierbar mit integriertem halbleitendem Kreis und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [1995/16] | English: | Transformer integrable with a semiconductor integrated circuit and method for producing thereof | [1995/16] | French: | Transformateur intégrable avec un circuit intégré semi-conducteur et sa méthode de fabrication | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 31.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90115799.0 / EP0413348 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3881244 (KENDALL DON LESLIE) [A] 3-5,10,11 * column 6, line 29 - line 60; figures 13-14B *; | [X]US4071378 (ANTHONY THOMAS R, et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * column 5, line 3 - line 45; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4080585 (MOLTHEN EDWARD HENRY) |