EP0663230 - Oxygen production by staged mixed conductor membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1995/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yee, Terrence Fu 303 Surrey Place Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 02 /
Srinivasan, Rajagopalan Sree 3714 Catherine Avenue Allentown, PA 1803 / US | 03 /
Thorogood, Robert Michael 104 Degas Court Cary, NC 27511 / US | [1995/29] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar, et al Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Marx, Lothar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100243.5 | 10.01.1995 | [1995/29] | Priority number, date | US19940180936 | 12.01.1994 Original published format: US 180936 | [1995/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0663230 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0663230 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663230 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, B01D53/32, C01B13/02 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
B01D53/225 (EP,US);
B01D53/226 (EP,US);
B01D53/227 (EP,US);
C01B13/0251 (EP,US);
B01D2257/104 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,US);
C21B5/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/29] | B01D53/22 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/29] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Sauerstoff mit mehrstufigen leitenden Mischmembranen | [1995/29] | English: | Oxygen production by staged mixed conductor membranes | [1995/29] | French: | Production d'oxygène avec membranes mixtes conductrices à plusieurs étapes | [1995/29] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97118460.1 / EP0821993 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.05.2001 | IT | 23.05.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 23.05.2001 | |
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 23.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]USRE34595E (CHEN MICHAEL S K [US], et al) [PA] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 34 - line 51; figures 1,2; claims 1-34 *; | US5035726 [ ] (CHEN MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [A]EP0521784 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 17 - line 44; figure -; claims 1-29 *; | [A]US4545787 (HEGARTY WILLIAM P [US]) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US5035727 (CHEN MICHAEL S [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 * |