EP0664147 - Catalyst for purifying exhaust gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hiromasa c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyoshi, Naoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Winter, Konrad Theodor Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Winter, Konrad Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kuhnen, Wacker & Partner Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100272.4 | 10.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | JP19940004436 | 20.01.1994 Original published format: JP 443694 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0664147 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0664147 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664147 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, B01D53/94 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20746 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/30] | Title | German: | Katalysator zur Reinigung von Abgasen | [1995/30] | English: | Catalyst for purifying exhaust gases | [1995/30] | French: | Catalyseur pour la purification de gaz d'échappement | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60200021 ; | [X]US4003976 (KOMATSU NOBORU, et al) [X] 4,5 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]EP0393517 (SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY [IT]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 37 *; | [A]EP0573672 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE4008371 (RIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 4 * claims 1-12 *; | [DA]JPH05317652 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860228), vol. 010, no. 051, Database accession no. (M - 457), & JP60200021 A 19851009 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940304), vol. 018, no. 134, Database accession no. (C - 1176), & JP05317652 A 19931203 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP;OTHERS: 02) [DA] 4 * abstract * |