EP0724999 - Energy absorbing impact barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation Four Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, North Carolina 28217 / US | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramer, James Harmon 2793 Erie Drive Fairlawn, Ohio 44333 / US | 02 /
Lynch, Daniel Sheldon 3812 Betsy Crescent Virginia Beach, Virginia 23456 / US | 03 /
Coker, Charles Wayne 669 Copper Kettle Drive, Virginia Beach Virginia 23464 / US | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1996/32] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100296.3 | 11.01.1995 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0724999 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0724999 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61L29/00, E01F13/12, E01F13/04 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
E01F13/046 (EP);
E01F13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | Energieaufzehrende Schutzvorrichtung | [1996/32] | English: | Energy absorbing impact barrier | [1996/32] | French: | Dispositif atténuateur de choc pour barrière | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 03.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/34] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4576507 (C.J. TERIO) [X] 1,2,6,35,36,46 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 21; figures 1,3,8,9 * [Y] 5,7-9,11-13,15,19,21,23,29,37,48,49; | [XY]US4824282 (D.E. WALDECKER) [X] 1,3,4,46 * the whole document * [Y] 37; | [XA]US4822207 (D.J. SWAHLAN) [X] 1,6 * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 68; figure 3 * [A] 29; | [YA]US4494738 (F.G. BRITTON) [Y] 7-9,11-13,15,19,21,23,29,37,48,49 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 21; figure - * * column 6, line 13 - line 31 * [A] 10,14,20,46; | [Y]DE9311182U (GEWA) [Y] 5 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0108275 (GOODRICH) [A] 7,12,47,48 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 3; figure 3 *; | [DA]US4887934 (J.H. KRAMER) |