EP0664139 - An indwelling injector needle assembly having wings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissho Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu, 531-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states Nissho Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu, 531-8510 / JP | ||
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states NISSHO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Kuranosuke 14-102, 7-ban, 1-cho, Shinkanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Kazuhiro 202 Haitsu Aoki, 1804, Misono, Ritto-cho Kurita-gun, Shiga-ken / JP | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100548.7 | 17.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | JP19940022075 | 21.01.1994 Original published format: JP 2207594 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664139 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664139 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
A61M25/0631 (EP,US);
A61M25/0637 (EP,US);
A61M5/158 (KR);
A61M5/3243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/30] | Title | German: | Eine Verweilinjektionsnadel mit Flügeln | [1995/30] | English: | An indwelling injector needle assembly having wings | [1995/30] | French: | Une aiguille d'injection à demeure munie d'ailes | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0550949 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [A] 1-5 * column A; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]DE9311765U (VIGGO SPECTRAMED AB HELSINGBOR [SE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0339812 (MENLO CARE INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0566769 (INT SAFETYJECT IND INC [CA]) [A] 1-5 * column A; figures 1-3 * | Examination | JPH01212561 |