EP0658623 - Attenuated herpesviruses, herpesviruses which include foreign DNA encoding an amino acid sequence and vaccines containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTRO CORPORATION 9669 Lackman Road Lenexa Kansas 66219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states SYNTRO CORPORATION 9669 Lackman Road Lenexa Kansas 66219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cochran, Mark D. 4506 Horizon Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
Shih, Meng-Fu 9235 Adolphia Sreet San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
MacConnell, William P. 1003 Woodgrove Drive Cardiff, California 92007 / US | 04 /
MacDonald, Richard D. 5648 Madra Avenue San Diego, California 92120 / US | 05 /
Chiang, Christina H. 13381 Jarman Place San Diego, California 92130 / US | [1995/41] |
Former [1995/25] | 01 /
Cochran, Mark D. 2866 Englewood Way Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | ||
02 /
Shih, Meng-Fu 10035 Canright Way San Diego, California 92126 / US | |||
03 /
MacConnell, William P. 1003 Woodgrove Drive Cardiff, California 92007 / US | |||
04 /
MacDonald, Richard D. 5648 Madra Avenue San Diego, California 92120 / US | |||
05 /
Chiang, Christina H. 13381 Jarman Place San Diego, California 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1997/36] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [1995/25] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100565.1 | 27.07.1988 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | US19870078519 | 27.07.1987 Original published format: US 78519 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0658623 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0658623 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, A61K39/245, A61K39/15, A61K39/155, A61K39/215 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/445 (EP);
C12N15/62 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP);
C07K2319/40 (EP);
C12N2710/16322 (EP);
C12N2710/16722 (EP);
C12N2710/16743 (EP);
C12N2720/12322 (EP);
C12N2750/14322 (EP);
C12N2760/18122 (EP);
C12N2760/18622 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/25] | C12N15/00, A61K39/245, A61K39/15, A61K39/155, A61K39/215 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/25] | Title | German: | Attenuierte Herpesviren, Herpesvirein, die eine Aminosäuresequenz kodierende fremde DNS beeinhalten, und sie enthaltende Impstoffe | [1995/25] | English: | Attenuated herpesviruses, herpesviruses which include foreign DNA encoding an amino acid sequence and vaccines containing same | [1995/25] | French: | Virus d'Herpes attenués, virus d'herpes comprenant de l'ADN étranger codante pour une séquence d'acides aminés, et vaccins les contenant | [1995/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 17.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88907889.5 / EP0332677 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8700862 (UPJOHN CO [US]); | [XP]WO8704463 (SYNTRO CORP [US]); |