EP0667257 - Closure for a seat trim cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL, INC. 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth Michigan 48170 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL INC. 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venuto, Dennis R. 22543 Shorewood Drive St. Clair Shores Michigan 48081 / US | 02 /
Sutton, Amy R. 41706 Village Green Blvd. W Canton Michigan 48187 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Bergen, Klaus, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 11 01 23 40501 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Bergen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König, Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen, Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 D-40219 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100748.3 | 20.01.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940194216 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: US 194216 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667257 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667257 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667257 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, A47C31/02 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
B60N2/5825 (EP,US);
A47C31/023 (EP,US);
B60N2/5816 (EP,US);
B60N2/803 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/33] | B60N2/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/33] | Title | German: | Verschluss eines Überzuges eines Sitzes | [1995/33] | English: | Closure for a seat trim cover | [1995/33] | French: | Fermeture d'une housse de garniture de sièges | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.07.1998 | IT | 08.07.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 08.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4786103 (SELBERT ALAN J [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 7; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE2826356 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4723816 (SELBERT ALAN J [US], et al); | [A]US5187843 (LYNCH JAMES P [US]); | [A]FR2686553 (FAURE BERTRAND AUTOMOBILE [FR]) |