EP0666392 - Lock casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinbach & Vollmann GmbH & Co. Parkstrasse 11 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1997/47] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states Steinbach & Vollmann GmbH & Co. Parkstrasse 11 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101042.0 | 26.01.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | DE19944403440 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4403440 | [1995/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666392 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0666392 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0666392 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B9/00 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
E05B9/00 (EP);
E05B65/02 (EP);
E05C9/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/48] |
Former [1995/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schlossgehäuse | [1995/32] | English: | Lock casing | [1995/32] | French: | Boîtier de serrure | [1995/32] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC | 07.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Eisenhüttenstr. 22 D-57074 Siegen / DE | [1998/40] | 29.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.03.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.07.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.01.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.11.1997 | AT | 26.01.2001 | GB | 26.01.2001 | IE | 26.01.2001 | LU | 26.01.2001 | PT | 26.01.2001 | ES | 27.01.2001 | CH | 31.01.2001 | LI | 31.01.2001 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
AT | 26.01.2001 | ||
GB | 26.01.2001 | ||
IE | 26.01.2001 | ||
LU | 26.01.2001 | ||
ES | 27.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
Former [2004/38] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
AT | 26.01.2001 | ||
GB | 26.01.2001 | ||
IE | 26.01.2001 | ||
ES | 27.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
AT | 26.01.2001 | ||
GB | 26.01.2001 | ||
IE | 26.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
AT | 26.01.2001 | ||
IE | 26.01.2001 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 19.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB626257 (JABEZ ASH, et al) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 51 - line 120; figure - *; | [Y]FR1217232 (ROZENTRAUB) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, column L, paragraph 2 - page 2, column R, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]AU518869B (LOWE & FLETCHER AUSTRALIA) [A] 1* page 5, line 1 - page 10, line 16; figure - *; | [Y]EP0155543 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 7, line 4 - page 12, line 4; figure - * |