EP0665656 - Inductive radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | For all designated states SECOM CO., LTD. 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
For all designated states SECOM CO., LTD. 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takayama, Masato, c/o Sony Corp. 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Amari, Yasufumi, c/o Secom Co., Ltd. 1-1 Sakaecho, 6-chome Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/31] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101083.4 | 26.01.1995 | [1995/31] | Priority number, date | JP19940026106 | 28.01.1994 Original published format: JP 2610694 | [1995/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0665656 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0665656 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665656 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
H04B5/266 (EP,KR,US);
H04B5/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1995/31] | Title | German: | Induktives Funkkommunikationssystem | [1995/31] | English: | Inductive radio communication system | [1995/31] | French: | Système inductif de communication par radio | [1995/31] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR703401 (MATERIEL TELEPHONIQUE) [A] 1 * page 2, line 99 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 22 - line 32 * * page 3, line 69 - line 86 *; | [XA]US3694751 (TAKAHASHI KENSAKU, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 9 * [A] 3; | [A] - TAKAHASHI K ET AL, "New induction radio system", 1969 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, BOULDER, CO, USA, 9-11 JUNE 1969, 1969, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 23.1 - 23.6, XP002007464 [A] 1,2 * pages 23-1, column R, paragraph L * * pages 23-2, column L, paragraph 2; figure 8A * |