EP0678238 - Sieve apparatus for combine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HCC, INC. 1501 1st Avenue Mendota Illinois 61342 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states HCC, INC. 1501 1st Avenue Mendota Illinois 61342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Truckenbrod, Thomas G. 2102 Cedar Avenue Mendota, Illinois 61342 / US | 02 /
Ramp, Benjamin E. 903 N. Linden Street No. 215 Normal, Illinois 61761 / US | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101089.1 | 26.01.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | US19940231256 | 22.04.1994 Original published format: US 231256 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678238 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678238 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01F12/44 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A01F12/446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Siebausbildung für Mähdrescher | [1995/43] | English: | Sieve apparatus for combine | [1995/43] | French: | Grille pour moissonneuse-batteuse | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2253296 (HOLTZMAN WILLIAM A); | [A]US2413382 (SARGENT DONALD E, et al); | [DA]US3334744 (JAMES HOWELL N, et al) [DA] 1,5,6,12 * column W *; | [A]GB2054335 (BAGGALEY D J) [A] 5 * page 1, line 60 - line 66 *; | [A]US4511466 (JONES DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1,6,12 * column 2, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US5176574 (MATOUSEK ROBERT A [US], et al) |