EP0671334 - Carton for supporting a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barlow, David Alan 56 Elms Crescent London, SW4 8QY / GB | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Pate, Frederick George, et al 55, Avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Pate, Frederick George, et al 55, Avenue Nestlé CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 95101260.8 | 31.01.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | GB19940003861 | 01.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9403861 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671334 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/52 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
B65D77/0433 (EP,US);
B65D5/545 (EP,US);
Y10S229/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/37] | Title | German: | Karton zum Unterstützen eines Behälters | [1995/37] | English: | Carton for supporting a container | [1995/37] | French: | Carton pour le support d'un récipient | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/02] | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE8506189U (TIPP EX VERTRIEB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,13 * page 1, paragraphs 2-3 * [Y] 6,8,9,11,12; | [X]GB2065072 (DANIN O) [X] 3-5,10,13 * page 1, line 116 - line 122; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0536103 (AKERLUND & RAUSING AB [SE]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 3; figure . *; | [YA]US3281051 (O'BRIEN ROBERT J, et al) [Y] 8,9,12 * column 4, line 13 - line 20; figure 1 * [A] 10; | [YA]FR2545062 (DEVILLE MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 11 * page 4, line 19 - line 23; figures 6,7 * [A] 10; | [A]GB694537 (LEENDERT DE VRIJER) [A] 12 * page 2, line 41 - line 48; figure 7 * |