EP0667265 - Composite wall, in particular a windscreen for a car, comprising an ultrasonic detector for detecting foreign bodies on one of its faces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 2501 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 CH-2501 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saurer, Eric Chemin de Cuard 17 CH-2022 Bevaix / CH | 02 /
Mignot, Jean-Pierre Rue du Chasselas 13 CH-2034 Peseux / CH | 03 /
Jeanmonod, Roland Rue Louis d'Orléans 41 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 95101261.6 | 31.01.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | FR19940001403 | 08.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9401403 | [1995/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667265 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667265 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08, G10K11/02 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G01V1/001 (EP,US);
B60J3/04 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B60S1/0822 (EP,US);
B60S1/0855 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Schichtenwand, insbesondere Windschutzscheibe für Kraftfahrzeuge, mit einer Ultraschalldetektionsvorrichtung zur Detektion von Fremdkörpern auf einer von ihren Seiten | [1995/33] | English: | Composite wall, in particular a windscreen for a car, comprising an ultrasonic detector for detecting foreign bodies on one of its faces | [1995/33] | French: | Paroi composite, notamment pare-brise pour véhicule automobile, comportant un dispositif de détection ultrasonore pour la détection de corps étrangers sur une de ses faces | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3528009 (RICHTER HANS JUERGEN DR [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0512653 (DYNAMAD SA [CH])[AD] 1; | [A]WO9400319 (ASULAB SA [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 15 - page 6, line 30; figure 2 * |