EP0662324 - Use of beta-adrenergic agonists for treating loss of function of striated muscles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Rowett Research Institute Greenburn Road Bucksburn Aberdeen AB2 9SB Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states The Rowett Research Institute Greenburn Road Bucksburn Aberdeen AB2 9SB Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maltin, Charlotte Woodside Cottage, Keith-Hall Estate Aberdeenshire AB51 0LE / GB | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd and Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95101362.2 | 12.09.1988 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | GB19870021602 | 15.09.1987 Original published format: GB 8721602 | GB19880003619 | 17.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8803619 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662324 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/275, A61K31/52 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/275 (EP);
A61K31/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Verwendung von beta-adrenergen Agonisten zur Behandlung von Funktionsverlusten der quergestreiften Muskeln | [1995/28] | English: | Use of beta-adrenergic agonists for treating loss of function of striated muscles | [1995/28] | French: | Utilisation d'agonistes bêta-adrénergiques pour le traitement des pertes de fonction des muscles striés | [1995/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/27] | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88308402.2 / EP0308157 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1995 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.1995 | 30.09.1996 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0026298 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [XY] 1-20 * page 1, lines 15-25 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 2 * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 15; example -; claim - *; | [XY]EP0117647 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [XY] 1-20 * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 4 * * page 10, lines 5-18; example -; claim - *; | [E]WO8908709 (TISDALE MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [E] 1-20 * page 16, lines 25-32 * * page 48, lines 16-32 * * page 49, lines 5-12; claim 16 *; | [X] - C.A. MALTIN, "The effect of the anabolic agent, clenbuterol, on overloaded rat skeletal muscle", BIOSCI. REP., (198702), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 143 - 149 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - N.J. ROTHWELL, "Modification of body composition by clenbuterol in normal and dystrophic (mdx) mice", BIOSCI. REP., (1985), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 755 - 760 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - R.J. ZEMAN, "Clenbuterol, a beta2-agonist, retards atrophy in denervated muscles.", AM. J. PHYSIOL., (198701), vol. 252, no. 1PT1, pages E152 - E155 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - C.A. MALTIN, "Inhibition and reversal of denervation-induced atrophy by the beta-agonist growth promoter, clenbuterol.", BIOSCI. REP., (1986), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 811 - 818 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - C.A. MALTIN, "Clenbuterol, a beta-agonist, induces growth in innervated and denervated rat soleus muscle via apparently different mechanisms.", BIOSCI. REP., (198706), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 525 - 532 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - P.W. EMERY, "Chronic effects of beta2-adrenergic agonists on body composition and protein synthesis in the rat.", BIOSCI. REP., (1984), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 83 - 91 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - D.H. BERMANN, "Effect of cimaterol and fishmeal on body composition and skeletal muscle growth in lambs.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1987), vol. 106, no. 7, Database accession no. 49103g [X] 1-3,5-11,16-20 * abstract * | [ ] - Proc. Cornell Nutr. Conf. Feed Manuf., 1986, pp. 29-38 | [X] - C.A. MALTIN, "Propranolol apparently separates the physical and compositional characteristics of muscle growth inducced by clenbuterol.", BIOSCI. REP., (198701), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 51 - 57 [X] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * | [PX] - P.J. REEDS, "The effect of beta-agonists and antagonists on muscle growth and body composition of young rat (rattus sp.)", COMP. BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 89C, no. 2, pages 337 - 341 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - R.W. KIERSTEAD, "Beta1-selective adrenoceptor antagonists. 1. Synthesis and beta-adrenergic blocking activity of a series of binary (aryloxy)propanolamines.", J. MED. CHEM., (1983), vol. 26, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00365a004, pages 1561 - 1569, XP002922416 [A] 12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00365a004 | [T] - C.A. MALTIN, "The effect of clenbuterol administration in utero and throughout lactation on pre- and post-natal muscle development in the rat.", GROWTH DEV. AGING, (1990), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 143 - 150 [T] 1-4,6-11,15-19 * the whole document * |