EP0667478 - Air duct for heating and ventilation or air-conditioning systems in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/33] | Quick-acting coupling for pipes, in particular for air ducts in heating and ventilation and/or air-conditioning systems in a motor vehicle | ||
[1998/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [1998/44] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harzendorf, Andi, Dipl.-Ing. Trierer Strasse 2 D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Knobloch, Udo Probsteigasse 13 D-55239 Gau-Odernheim / DE | 03 /
Springer, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Auf dem Maindamm 12 D-65462 Gustavsburg / DE | 04 /
Detampel, Heinz Moritz-von-Schwind-Strasse 22 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Bergerin, Ralf, et al ADAM OPEL AG Patentwesen/80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Bergerin, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing., et al ADAM OPEL AG, Patentwesen/80-30 D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101469.5 | 03.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | DE19944404520 | 12.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4404520 | [1995/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667478 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667478 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP);
F16L25/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1995/33] | Title | German: | Luftkanal für Luftleitungen einer Heizungs- und Belüftungs- bzw. einer Klimaanlage eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1998/19] | English: | Air duct for heating and ventilation or air-conditioning systems in a motor vehicle | [1998/19] | French: | Conduits d'air pour système de chauffage et de ventilation ou de conditionnement d'air dans une voiture automobile | [1998/19] |
Former [1995/33] | Schnellkupplung für Rohrleitungen, insbesondere für Luftleitungen einer Heizungs- und Belüftungs- bzw. einer Klimaanlage eines Kraftfahrzeugs | ||
Former [1995/33] | Quick-acting coupling for pipes, in particular for air ducts in heating and ventilation and/or air-conditioning systems in a motor vehicle | ||
Former [1995/33] | Raccord à action rapide pour conduits, en particulier pour conduits d'air dans un système de chauffage, de ventilation ou de conditionnement d'air dans une voiture automobile | Examination procedure | 07.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8901109 (ELCONNEX PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5052721 (GORMAN JR PHILIP P [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 * |