EP0666055 - A pulsimeter provided with or without a pedometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takenaka, Masaaki, c/o Omron Corp. Int. Prop. Cen., 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | 02 /
Yoshimura, Manabu, c/o Omron Corp. Int. Prop. Cen., 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | 03 /
Yamasawa, Tsutomu, c/o Omron Corp. Int. Prop. Cen., 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | 04 /
Hasegawa, Maki, c/o Omron Corp. Int. Prop. Cen., 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | 05 /
Hirano, Masatsugu, c/o Omron Corp. Int. Prop. Cen., 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | 06 /
Nishida, Satoshi, c/o Omron Corp. Int. Prop. Cen., 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101500.7 | 03.02.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | JP19940011434 | 03.02.1994 Original published format: JP 1143494 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0666055 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0666055 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (KR);
A61B5/02422 (EP,US);
A61B5/02433 (EP,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,US);
A61B5/6838 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
G04B37/1433 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/32] | Title | German: | Pulsanzeigegerät mit oder ohne Pedometer | [1995/32] | English: | A pulsimeter provided with or without a pedometer | [1995/32] | French: | Indicateur de pouls avec ou sans pédomètre | [1995/32] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/40] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5679382 ; | [XA]DE2915912 (OLTEN AG ELEKTRO APPARATEBAU) [X] 1,7,9 * page 4, line 23 - line 35; figure 2 * * page 5, line 15 - line 21 * * abstract * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 22 * [A] 3-5,9,10; | [XA]DE2928588 (HEIM CARL MICHAEL DIPL ING) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 10, line 4 - line 30 * * page 12, line 10 - line 14; figures 1-4; claims 1,6,7 * [A] 4,5,7,9,10; | [A]US4305401 (REISSMUELLER MANFRED W, et al) [A] 1,4,7,9,10 * column 4, line 21 - line 63 * * column 5, line 5 - line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4332258 (ARAI ASAJIRO, et al) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [X]US4338950 (BARLOW JR CARL A, et al) [X] 10 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2; claims 1-12 *; | [A]US4353152 (O'CONNOR ARTHUR H, et al) [A] 1,4,7 * column 3, line 30 - line 64; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]FR2583282 (CREUSOT INST UNIVERS TECHNOL [FR]) [A] 10 * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 8; claims 1-4,7 *; | [A]EP0360977 (MISAWA HOMES RES INST [JP]) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9118550 (LE FIT LTD [GB]) [X] 10 * page 3, line 14 - line 38 * * claims 1-3 * * page 6, line 32 - line 39 * [A] 9; | [A]US5218966 (YAMASAWA TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 16; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0614070 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [PA] 10* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810916), vol. 005, no. 146, Database accession no. (P - 080), & JP56079382 A 19810629 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 10 * abstract * |