EP0667551 - Foldable spectacles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/33] | Spectacles | ||
[2001/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheller, Hansruedi Moorschwand CH-8815 Horgenberg / CH | [1995/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95101572.6 | 07.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | CH19940000454 | 15.02.1994 Original published format: CH 45494 | [1995/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667551 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667551 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/08 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G02C5/08 (EP,US);
G02C5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/33] | Title | German: | Faltbrille | [2001/05] | English: | Foldable spectacles | [2001/05] | French: | Lunettes pliables | [2001/05] |
Former [1995/33] | Brille | ||
Former [1995/33] | Spectacles | ||
Former [1995/33] | Lunettes | Examination procedure | 03.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.10.2001 | AT | 07.02.2002 | BE | 28.02.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2016/29] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 24.10.2001 | |
AT | 07.02.2002 | ||
BE | 28.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | NL | 24.10.2001 | |
AT | 07.02.2002 | ||
BE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | NL | 24.10.2001 | |
AT | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 24.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB397632 (AUBREY JOSEPH MORRIS); | [A]FR983775 (E. DOVERGNE); | [A]FR2231980 (SALAS PELLICER ANTONIO [ES]); | [A]DE3019891 (FORTINI UMBERTO) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 20 - page 6, line 2; figure 7 *; | [A]FR2538921 (RATTI IND OTTICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 30; figure 3 *; | [Y]GB2245989 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4 - page 5, line 2; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]DE9105449U (D. HUANG) [Y] 1-5 * page 4 - page 5; figure 3 * |