EP0671165 - Collagen-based injectable drug delivery system and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cohesion Technologies, Inc. 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2001/01] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states COLLAGEN CORPORATION 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenblatt, Joel S. 2651 South Court Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Berg, Richard A. 660 South Springer Road Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1995/37] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101589.0 | 06.02.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | US19940193600 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: US 193600 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0671165 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0671165 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671165 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K47/42, A61M37/00 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
A61K9/2063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/37] | Title | German: | Injizierbares Verabreichungssystem für Arzneistoffe auf Kollagen-Basis und seine Verwendung | [1995/37] | English: | Collagen-based injectable drug delivery system and its use | [1995/37] | French: | Système injectable pour la délivrance d'un médicament à base de collagène et son utilisation | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/21] | 15.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.04.2001 | IT | 11.04.2001 | LI | 11.04.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/15] | CH | 11.04.2001 | |
LI | 11.04.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9401483 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3-27 * page 8, line 1 - line 8 * * page 8, line 28 - line 33 * * page 11, line 29 - line 30 * * page 12, line 17 - line 20 * * page 14, line 16 - page 16, line 3 * * page 33, line 29 - page 38, line 6 * * page 46, line 23 - page 47, line 12 * * claims 1,6-10,12 *; | [Y]JPS6363624 ; | [Y]WO8504413 (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US]) [Y] 1,3-27 * page 2, line 29 - line 31 * * page 3, line 7 - line 9 * * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 8 * * page 8, line 8 - line 12 *; | [D]US4703108 (SILVER FREDERICK A [US], et al); | [Y]EP0160266 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3-27 * abstract *; | [A]JPS52139783 ; | [A]WO9300890 (VITAPHORE CORP [US]) [A] * claims 1,3-6,8 * | [DY] - J. ROSENBLATT ET AL., "Chain rigidity and diffusional release in biopolymer gels", PROCEED. INTERN. SYMP. CONTROL. REL. BIOACT. MATER., vol. 20, pages 264 - 265 [DY] 1,3-27 * the whole document * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 17, Database accession no. 88-116590, & JPS6363624 A 19880322 (KAKIZAKI E.) [Y] 1,3-27 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 02, Database accession no. 78-02963a, & JPS52139783 A 19771121 (NIPPI K.K.) [A] * abstract * |