EP0667394 - Recombinant antibody produced by transformed Bacillus bacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | For all designated states Udaka, Shigezo 24-3, Uezonocho 1-chome Meitoh-ku Nagoya Aichi 465 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states Udaka, Shigezo 24-3, Uezonocho 1-chome Meitoh-ku Nagoya Aichi 465 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagata, Hideo 65-35, Mejiroday 2-chome Hachioji, Tokyo 193 / JP | 02 /
Udaka, Shigezo 24-3, Uezonocho 1-chome, Meitoh-ku Nagoya, Aichi 465 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Yasushi 20-2, Hinode 2-chome Funahashi, Chiba 273 / JP | 04 /
Tada, Hiroko 20-22, Ishimacho 2-chome Okayama, Okayama 700 / JP | 05 /
Iwasa, Susumu 21-2, Ohsumigaoka 1-chome, Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun, Kyoto 610-03 / JP | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/33] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101615.3 | 08.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | JP19940016385 | 10.02.1994 Original published format: JP 1638594 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667394 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667394 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C07K16/00, C07K16/40, C07K16/18, C12N15/75, C12N1/21 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Rekombinanter Antikörper von transformierten Bacillus-Bakterien hergestellt | [1995/33] | English: | Recombinant antibody produced by transformed Bacillus bacteria | [1995/33] | French: | Anticorps recombiné produit par des bactéries Bacillus transformées | [1995/33] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 30.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 06.02.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/33] | 10.03.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0146901 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,8,10,13-15 * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 1 * * claim - *; | [DA]EP0491351 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-16 * examples 6-9 * * claim - *; | [PX]EP0614982 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT]) [PX] 1,3,6-10,13-15 * column W * | [A] - H. YAMAGATA ET AL., "Detection of plasmids in Bacillus brevis species and introduction of a plasmid into B. brevis 47, a protein-producing bacterium, by cotransformation.", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, vol. 48, no. 4, pages 1069 - 1071 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [DA] - H. TAKAGI ET AL., "Potential use of Bacillus brevis HPD31 for the production of foreign proteins.", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, vol. 53, no. 8, pages 2279 - 2280, XP000082022 [DA] 1-16 * the whole document * | [DA] - H. YAMAGATA ET AL., "Use of Bacillus brevis for efficient synthesis and secretion of human epidermal growth factor.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, WASHINGTON, DC, USA, vol. 86, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.10.3589, pages 3589 - 3593, XP000918980 [DA] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.10.3589 | [DA] - S. UDAKA ET AL., "High-level secretion of heterologous proteins by Bacillus brevis.", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, USA, vol. 217, no. H, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(93)17053-8, pages 23 - 33, XP000940925 [DA] 1-16 * conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(93)17053-8 |