EP0667339 - Novel unsaturated peroxides, polymeric peroxides derived therefrom and their uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/33] | Novel unsaturated peroxides, polymeric derived therefrom and their uses | ||
[1998/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanchez, Jose 1624 Huth Road Grand Island, New York, 14072 / US | 02 /
Palys, Leonard H. 286 W. Klein Road Amherst, New York 14240 / US | 03 /
Stein, Daryl L. 9667 Roundhouse Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
Yormick, John S. 387 Washington Avenue Kenmore, New York 14217 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101689.8 | 08.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940196339 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: US 196339 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667339 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667339 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C409/20 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
C07C409/40 (EP,US);
C07C409/16 (EP,US);
C07C409/20 (EP,US);
C07C409/22 (EP,US);
C07C409/38 (EP,US);
C08F4/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1995/33] | Title | German: | Neue ungesättigte Peroxydverbindungen, davon abgeleitete polymere Peroxide und deren Verwendungen | [1998/19] | English: | Novel unsaturated peroxides, polymeric peroxides derived therefrom and their uses | [1998/19] | French: | Nouveaux peroxydes insaturés, polymères peroxydes en dérivant et leurs emplois | [1998/19] |
Former [1995/33] | Neue ungesättigte Peroxydverbindungen, diese enthaltende Polymeren, und deren Verwendung | ||
Former [1995/33] | Novel unsaturated peroxides, polymeric derived therefrom and their uses | ||
Former [1995/33] | Nouveaux peroxydes insaturés, polymères en dérivant et leur emploi | Examination procedure | 21.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.05.1998 | LI | 06.05.1998 | DK | 06.08.1998 | LU | 08.02.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | CH | 06.05.1998 | |
LI | 06.05.1998 | ||
DK | 06.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | CH | 06.05.1998 | |
LI | 06.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0225091 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP])[A] 1-10; | [A]EP0294237 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [DA]EP0381135 (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA [US]) [DA] 1-10; | [DA]US5011981 (TSUBONIWA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-10 |