EP0675286 - Axial piston machine with hydrostatic relief of the rocker body bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brueninghaus Hydromatik GmbH Glockeraustrasse 2 89275 Elchingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH Glockeraustrasse 2 D-89275 Elchingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Josef Riedwiesen 12 D-72401 Haigerloch 2 / DE | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101841.5 | 10.02.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | DE19944409370 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4409370 | [1995/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675286 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675286 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/20, F01B3/00 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
F01B3/0073 (EP);
F04B1/2085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | Axialkolbenmaschine mit hydrostatischer Enlastung ihrer gleitflächengelagerten Steuerlinse | [1995/40] | English: | Axial piston machine with hydrostatic relief of the rocker body bearing | [1995/40] | French: | Machine à pistons axiaux avec décharge hydrostatique du palier du plateau d'impulseur | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2100028 (DIENER) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3402634 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2207198 (LINDE AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2135776 (RENAULT) |