Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07253210 | Global Dossier | 03.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0668469 | Global Dossier | 30.07.1997 | B1 | EP0668469 | 24.04.1996 | A3 | EP0668469 | 23.08.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9500653 | 24.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2142670 | 14.10.1997 | C | CA2142670 | 18.08.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1106526C | 23.04.2003 | C | CN1114728 | 10.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69500474T | 26.02.1998 | T2 | DE69500474D1 | 04.09.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2105789T | 16.10.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100229965B | 15.11.1999 | B1 | KR950033242 | 22.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5387100 | 07.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US19799194 | 17.02.1994 |