Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5763897 | 09.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US90750497 | 08.08.1997 | US39166795 | 21.02.1995 | JP2391194 | 22.02.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6006514 | 28.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US90750497 | 08.08.1997 | US30498699 | 04.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07234389 | Global Dossier | 05.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2391194 | 22.02.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0668525 | Global Dossier | 18.09.1996 | A3 | EP0668525 | 23.08.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2391194 | 22.02.1994 |