EP0668525 - Semiconductor optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sano, Hirohisa 5-29-210, Nobitome-4-chome Niiza-shi / JP | 02 /
Ido, Tatemi 32-D-201, Koyasumachi-2-chome Hachioji-shi / JP | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102286.2 | 17.02.1995 | [1995/34] | Priority number, date | JP19940023911 | 22.02.1994 Original published format: JP 2391194 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0668525 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0668525 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/025 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
G02F1/01708 (EP,US);
F27B7/166 (EP,US);
G02F1/0153 (EP,US);
G02F1/2257 (EP,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1995/34] | Title | German: | Optische Hableiter-Vorrichtung | [1995/34] | English: | Semiconductor optical device | [1995/34] | French: | Dispositif optique à semi-conducteur | [1995/34] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 02.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4913506 (SUZUKI MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 4* column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 10; figure 4 *; | [X] - WOOD T H, "Multiple quantum well (MQW) waveguide modulators", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, JUNE 1988, USA, ISSN 0733-8724, vol. 6, no. 6, pages 743 - 757, XP000050072 [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * figure 5; page 749, right column, line 26 - page 750, left column, line 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.4063 | [A] - KOTAKA I ET AL, "High-speed InGaAs/InAlAs multiple-quantum-well optical modulator", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART 2 (ELECTRONICS), JUNE 1992, USA, ISSN 8756-663X, vol. 75, no. 6, pages 24 - 31, XP000316207 [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * sections 1,2,5; figures 1,8,11 * | [A] - ZUCKER J E, "InP-based quantum wells for electro-optic waveguide circuits", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS, PARIS, FRANCE, 19-22 APRIL 1993, ISBN 0-7803-0993-6, MAY 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 665 - 667, XP000462838 [A] 1,2,4-6 * section 1; figure 1 * |