EP0672400 - Cooling cylindrical device for therapeutic treatment of hemorrhoids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TROP LIFE LTD. 7, Bezalel St., P.O. Box 633 Ofakim 80300 / IL | [1995/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trop, Moshe 956, 47 street Brooklyn, N.Y. 11219 / US | 02 /
Kushelvesky, Avraham Bosmat 29 Metar 85025 / IL | 03 /
Mazor, Gedalya En-Zik 20 Metar 85025 / IL | 04 /
Popov, Sergay Harif 414 Ofakim / IL | 05 /
Baybikov, Boris Hnehalim 60/6 Mahale Edomim / IL | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/38] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, Dr. Haseltine Lake Partners Motorama Haus 502 Rosenheimer Strasse 30 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102418.1 | 21.02.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | IL19940108744 | 22.02.1994 Original published format: IL 10874494 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0672400 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0672400 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672400 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0028 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0056 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/38] | Title | German: | Kühlendes zylindrisches Gerät zur therapeutischen Behandlung von Hämorrhoiden | [1995/38] | English: | Cooling cylindrical device for therapeutic treatment of hemorrhoids | [1995/38] | French: | Dispositif cylindrique refroidissant pour traitement thérapeutique d'hémorroides | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 27.05.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Request for further processing for: | 09.08.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1999 | BE | 03.11.1999 | CH | 03.11.1999 | ES | 03.11.1999 | FR | 03.11.1999 | GR | 03.11.1999 | IT | 03.11.1999 | LI | 03.11.1999 | NL | 03.11.1999 | SE | 03.11.1999 | DK | 03.02.2000 | PT | 03.02.2000 | LU | 21.02.2000 | MC | 29.02.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
FR | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
LU | 21.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
LU | 21.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
CH | 08.02.2000 | ||
LI | 08.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
CH | 08.02.2000 | ||
LI | 08.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE421217 (EVERHARDS ET AL.) [Y] 17,18 * claim 1 *; | [XY]FR353647 (FREDERICK HOFMANN [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 3 - line 4 * * page 1, line 17 * * page 2, line 13 - line 22 * [Y] 4-15; | [A]US1941173 (KARL LARK-HOROVITZ) [A] 19* page 1, line 98 - line 101 *; | [Y]FR2100019 (MILLS INDUSTRIES [US]) [Y] 19-24 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 25 *; | [Y]FR2360031 (KLEIN MAX [FR]) [Y] 17,18 * claims 1,6 *; | [XA]US4331151 (GOLDEN THEODORE A) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 62 - line 66 * [A] 9,11; | [YA]FR2545717 (WERNER KRYSTYNA [FR]) [Y] 16 * claim 2 * [A] 11,20,22; | [Y]US4614191 (PERLER ROBERT F [US]) [Y] 16 * column 2, line 62 - line 65 *; | [XY]US4638806 (BARTLETT LAWRENCE D [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 3, line 3 - line 13 * [Y] 4-15; | [A]DE8804039U (MAASS) [A] 17 * page 1, line 21 - line 27 *; | [A]FR2613611 (BAUMGARTEN FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 16 * page 2, line 32 - line 39; claim 6 *; | [Y]US4841970 (RAND HERBERT [US]) [Y] 19-24 * column 2, line 61 - line 64 * |