EP0672780 - A process and an apparatus suitable for providing, directly by means of calendering, an excellent anchorage between a fabric and its plastic coating material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERPLASTICA SA Viale Serfontana 10 6834 Morbio Inferiore / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states INTERPLASTICA SA Viale Serfontana 10 CH-6834 Morbio Inferiore / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fux, Charly Via Penudria 13 CH-6929 Cravesano / CH | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Klausner, Erich c/o Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Ing. C. Gregorj S.p.A. Via Dogana 1 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Klausner, Erich c/o Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Ing. C. Gregorj S.p.A. Via Dogana 1 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95102559.2 | 23.02.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI00493 | 17.03.1994 Original published format: IT MI940493 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672780 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672780 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/00 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
D06N3/0088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/38] | Extension states | LT | 07.03.1995 | SI | 07.03.1995 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kalandrieren von Gewebe mit Kunststoffbeschichtungsmaterial mit einer exzellenten Verankerung | [1995/38] | English: | A process and an apparatus suitable for providing, directly by means of calendering, an excellent anchorage between a fabric and its plastic coating material | [1995/38] | French: | Procédé et appareil permettant, par calandrage, un bon ancrage entre un tissu et son revêtement plastique | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH370737 (MAURER SA ING A [CH]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US3294613 (ERICH EICHLER) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 1 - line 5; figure .; claim - * * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 7 *; | [Y]US4052521 (FERRARI SERGE) [Y] 1-4 * claim - *; | [A]US4388364 (SANDERS KENNETH H) [A] 1,5* column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 20; figure 4 * | [YA] - ZICKLER, D., "DAS WALZENSCHMELZVERFAHREN", TEXTILTECHNIK, vol. 25, no. 11, pages 704 - 706 [Y] 1-4 * page 704, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, line 29; figure 1 * * page 705, line 9 - line 20 * [A] 5 |