EP0671522 - Roof window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTO FRANK Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 145-149 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1997/44] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states ROTO FRANK Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 145-149 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Johann Schreinerstrasse 18 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
Sill, Michael Zeisigstrasse 12 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
Wöhrn, Volker Moltkestrasse 8 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1995/37] | Application number, filing date | 95102608.7 | 24.02.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | DE19940003993U | 10.03.1994 Original published format: DE 9403993 U | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671522 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671522 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/035, E05D15/40 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
E04D13/0357 (EP);
E05D15/406 (EP);
E05Y2900/152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR [1995/37] | Title | German: | Dachfenster | [1995/37] | English: | Roof window | [1995/37] | French: | Lucarne | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1227781 (DEVESNES, SIEGEL) [Y] 1,4 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 1, column 1, paragraph 9 - page 1, column 2, paragraph 5 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3630560 (ATKINS NORMAN C, et al) [A] 5 * column 4, line 24 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 3,10 *; | [YD]DE2708785 (STUCKE LOTHAR) [YD] 1,4 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [PA]DE9406929U (ROTO FRANK AG [DE]) |