EP0671560 - CYLINDER HEAD ASSEMBLY OF A DIESEL ENGINE WITH A HOLDING DEVICE FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE AS WELL AS A HOLDING DEVICE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL INJECTION PUMP ACTING ON THAT FUEL INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/37] | Holding device for a fuel injection valve as well as holding device for an individual injection pump acting on that fuel injection valve | ||
[1998/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [1998/15] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reitz, Dieter, Dipl. Ing. Heideweg 3 D-64367 Mühltal / DE | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Kümpfel, Heinz, et al Adam Opel AG, Patentwesen / 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Kümpfel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Adam Opel AG, Patentwesen / 80-34 D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102643.4 | 24.02.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | DE19944408385 | 12.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4408385 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671560 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671560 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/14, F02M39/02, F02M55/02 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
F02M39/02 (EP);
F02M55/02 (EP);
F02M61/14 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB [1995/37] | Title | German: | ZYLINDERKOPFANORDNUNG EINES DIESELMOTORS MIT EINER HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL SOWIE EINER HALTERUNG FÜR EINE AUF DIESES WIRKENDE EINZELEINSPRITZPUMPE | [1998/15] | English: | CYLINDER HEAD ASSEMBLY OF A DIESEL ENGINE WITH A HOLDING DEVICE FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE AS WELL AS A HOLDING DEVICE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL INJECTION PUMP ACTING ON THAT FUEL INJECTION VALVE | [1998/15] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE CULASSE D'UN MOTEUR DIESEL AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN POUR UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE COMBUSTIBLE AINSI QU' AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN POUR UNE POMPE A INJECTION INDIVIDUELLE AGISSANT SUR CETTE SOUPAPE DE COMBUSTIBLE | [1998/15] |
Former [1995/37] | Haltevorrichtung für ein Kraftstoffeinspritzventil sowie Halterung für eine auf dieses Kraftstoffeinspritzventil wirkende Einzeleinspritzpumpe | ||
Former [1995/37] | Holding device for a fuel injection valve as well as holding device for an individual injection pump acting on that fuel injection valve | ||
Former [1995/37] | Dispositif de maintien pour une soupape d'injection de combustible ainsi que dispositif de maintien pour une pompe à injection individuelle agissant sur cette soupape d'injection de combustible | Examination procedure | 20.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE445830 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE694245 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]DE703312 (SAURER AG ADOLPH); | [A]US2354403 (CARLO REGGIO FERDINANDO); | [A]FR2012144 (TATRA NP PODNIK) [A] 1 * page 2, line 8 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]DE2948407 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]GB2153908 (LUCAS IND PLC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3728961 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]FR2670534 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 34 - page 8, line 16; figure 1 *; | [ADP]DE4318434 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [ADP] 1 * the whole document * |