EP0729017 - Method for measurement and compensation of stray light in a spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard GmbH Herrenberger Strasse 130 D-71034 Böblingen / DE | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Beno, Dr. Enztalweg 6 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE | 02 /
Martin, Roland Silvanerstrasse 19 D-76228 Karlsruhe / DE | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Harbach, Thomas Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Harbach, Thomas c/o Hewlett-Packard GmbH, Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102729.1 | 25.02.1995 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729017 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729017 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G01J3/2803 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Messen und Kompensieren von Streulicht in einem Spektrometer | [1996/35] | English: | Method for measurement and compensation of stray light in a spectrometer | [1996/35] | French: | Méthode pour mesurer et compenser de la lumière parasitaire dans un spectromètre | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.07.1998 | IT | 08.07.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 08.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2119086 (BODENSEEWERK PERKIN ELMER CO) [X] 1-5 * page 1, lines 21-42 * * page 4, line 61 - page 5, line 16 *; | [A]JPS6079248 ; | [A]DE3211571 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 7, lines 14-31 *; | [DA]US4798464 (BOOSTROM ROY E [US]) [DA] 1-3 * column 3, lines 40-56 *; | [A]EP0449442 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,2 *; | [E]EP0652423 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3 * figure 5; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850907), vol. 009, no. 221, Database accession no. (P - 386), & JP60079248 A 19850507 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |